MN HF2380 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MNsure operation funding modified.
Title
MNsure operation funding modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2016-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2016-03-10 | House | Authors added Kresha; Swedzinski; Anderson, P.; Albright; and Howe. |
2016-03-08 | House | Author added Petersburg. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3121 (Similar To) 2016-03-23 - Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing