MN HF2388 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Authors added Lee, F.; Brand; Finke; Fischer
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Authors added Lee, F.; Brand; Finke; Fischer
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Upper Sioux Agency State Park transfer required, and report required.
Title
Upper Sioux Agency State Park transfer required, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Authors added Lee, F.; Brand; Finke; Fischer |
2023-03-06 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn; Pursell |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2250 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment, Climate, and Legacy