MN HF2424 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Authors added Mahoney and Sundin.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Authors added Mahoney and Sundin.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Call center or customer service relocation notice required, and recapture of public subsidies provided.
Title
Call center or customer service relocation notice required, and recapture of public subsidies provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Jon Applebaum [D] |
Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Authors added Mahoney and Sundin. |
2016-04-21 | House | Authors added Davnie, Applebaum, Metsa, and Hilstrom. |
2016-04-20 | House | Author added Schoen. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2505 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development