MN HF2576 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 246 05/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 246 05/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal record expungement governing provisions modified, business screening services required to delete expunged records, and eviction record expungement allowed in some cases.
Title
Criminal record expungement governing provisions modified, business screening services required to delete expunged records, and eviction record expungement allowed in some cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 84 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 85 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 85 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 246 05/14/14 | |
2014-05-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Third reading vote: 58-4 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-09 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 58-4 |
2014-05-08 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 84-48 |
2014-05-08 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-08 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-08 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate conferees Champion; Petersen, B.; Goodwin |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2014-04-29 | House | House conferees Melin, Hilstrom, Cornish |
2014-04-29 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-04-29 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate conferees Champion; Petersen B.; Goodwin |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2014-04-29 | Senate | House conferees Melin; Hilstrom; Cornish |
2014-04-29 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 41-25 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-25 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2214 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2214, now on General Orders |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-09 | House | Authors added Moran, Clark, and Murphy, M. |
2014-04-08 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 85-47 |
2014-04-08 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-08 | House | Amended |
2014-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Early Childhood and Youth Development Policy |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Policy |