MN HF2580 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author changed Moran shown as chief author.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author changed Moran shown as chief author.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Racial impact screening of legislation required.
Title
Racial impact screening of legislation required.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author changed Moran shown as chief author. |
2017-05-21 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-04-18 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-04-05 | House | Authors added Lee and Liebling. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF138 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Author added Dziedzic