MN HF2621 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House: Author added Anderson, S.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House: Author added Anderson, S.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education benefit eligibility requirement eliminated for surviving spouse and children of a deceased veteran who dies as a result of military service.
Title
Higher education benefit eligibility requirement eliminated for surviving spouse and children of a deceased veteran who dies as a result of military service.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Al Doty [D] | Rep. Mary Ellen Otremba [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. John Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | House: Author added Anderson, S. | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-04 | House: Referred by Chair to Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs Finance Division | |
2010-02-26 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-16 | House: Author added Otremba | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred by Chair to Veterans Affairs Division | |
2010-02-11 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2010-02-08 | House: Author added Ward | |
2010-02-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs |