MN HF2792 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus public safety bill.
Title
Omnibus public safety bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-04-25 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF802 |
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-08 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF802 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Author stricken Kent