MN HF2793 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
2014 reading tax credit modified and made permanent.
Title
2014 reading tax credit modified and made permanent.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2016-04-06 | House | Author added McDonald. |
2016-03-29 | House | Author added Moran. |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2283 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Referred to Taxes