MN HF2881 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 225 04/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 225 04/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Qualified persons with medical training or supervision authorized to take blood samples from DWI offenders, and legal immunity provided.
Title
Qualified persons with medical training or supervision authorized to take blood samples from DWI offenders, and legal immunity provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Kory Kath [D] | Rep. Ann Lenczewski [D] | Rep. Terry Morrow [D] |
Rep. David Olin [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 225 04/10/10 | |
2010-04-10 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-04-08 | Presentment date | |
2010-04-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-04-07 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2010-04-07 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2010-04-07 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-04-07 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2010-04-07 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-04-07 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. Calendar SF2817 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-03-23 | House: Amended | |
2010-03-23 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-03-23 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-03-22 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day 03/23/10 | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Author added Lenczewski | |
2010-02-11 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |