MN HF2907 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data sharing permitted to administer the disabled veteran's homestead market value exclusion.
Title
Data sharing permitted to administer the disabled veteran's homestead market value exclusion.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2953 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy