MN HF299 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lindstrom; Allmensrat Wilderness Park funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Lindstrom; Allmensrat Wilderness Park funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division | |
2009-12-22 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-03-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Finance Division | |
2009-03-10 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Finance | |
2009-01-26 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-01-26 | House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0299&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0299.0.pdf |