MN HF3009 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Centers for independent living funding provided for services to veterans, and money appropriated.
Title
Centers for independent living funding provided for services to veterans, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Liebling, Bennett, Hamilton, Johnson, C. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2653 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy