MN HF3036 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metro Meals on Wheels funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Metro Meals on Wheels funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Morrison |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Her and Hornstein |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Greenman |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2933 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Author added Wiger