MN HF3065 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sign language and English interpreter requirements modified.
Title
Sign language and English interpreter requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Daniels |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3012 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy