MN HF3090 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stalking crime modified.
Title
Stalking crime modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gardner [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Michael Paymar [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division | |
2010-03-04 | House: Author added Hamilton | |
2010-02-26 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-02-25 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2010-02-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-02-22 | House: Referred by Chair to Crime Victims/Criminal Records Division |