MN HF3090 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 26, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 26, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student loan counseling program unworkable requirement eliminated.
Title
Student loan counseling program unworkable requirement eliminated.
Sponsors
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Sen. Erik Simonson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 26, 2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Second reading |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2016-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2544 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Second reading