MN HF3108 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Elections provisions modified.
Title
Elections provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Governor approval April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State Chapter 201 04/01/10 | |
2010-04-01 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-03-29 | Presentment date | |
2010-03-29 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-03-25 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2010-03-25 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-03-25 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-03-25 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-03-25 | House: Conference committee report | |
2010-03-25 | House: Senate conferees Sieben, Gerlach, Rest | |
2010-03-25 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-03-24 | House: House conferees Winkler, Pelowski, Kiffmeyer | |
2010-03-24 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-03-24 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Senate conferees Sieben; Gerlach; Rest | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: House conferees Winkler; Pelowski; Kiffmeyer | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: General Orders: Rule 45 amendment stricken | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Calendar: Stricken, placed on General Orders | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. Calendar SF2388 | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-11 | House: Author added Loeffler | |
2010-03-11 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-03-11 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-03-11 | House: Amended | |
2010-03-11 | House: Amendments offered | |
2010-03-11 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-03-08 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-08 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-04 | House: Author added Poppe | |
2010-02-25 | House: Author added Kahn | |
2010-02-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |