MN HF3108 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Immunity from prosecution for controlled substance and alcohol violations provided for sexual assault victim and persons assisting the victim.
Title
Immunity from prosecution for controlled substance and alcohol violations provided for sexual assault victim and persons assisting the victim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-03-05 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Jordan |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Long |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Miller |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF217 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Author added Housley