MN HF3216 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - House: Author added Obermueller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - House: Author added Obermueller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Report required on at-risk businesses and a fast-action economic response team created.
Title
Report required on at-risk businesses and a fast-action economic response team created.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Larry Haws [D] | Rep. Gail Jackson [D] |
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Michael Obermueller [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] |
Rep. Marsha Swails [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | House: Author added Obermueller | |
2010-03-17 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-17 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2010-03-11 | House: Author added Haws | |
2010-03-09 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division | |
2010-03-02 | House: Referred by Chair to Bioscience and Workforce Development Policy and Oversight Division | |
2010-03-01 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF3216&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF3216.0.pdf |