MN HF3325 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Akland, and Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Akland, and Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Carjacking crime established, and conforming changes made.
Title
Carjacking crime established, and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Authors added Torkelson, Anderson, Akland, and Boe |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Scott and Gruenhagen |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Lueck |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added O'Neill |
2022-02-17 | House | Authors added Dettmer and Haley |
2022-02-15 | House | Author added Backer |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3149 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy