MN HF3329 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement agencies required to report carjacking date to commissioner of public safety, and commissioner required to public carjacking data in commissioners' annual uniform crime report.
Title
Law enforcement agencies required to report carjacking date to commissioner of public safety, and commissioner required to public carjacking data in commissioners' annual uniform crime report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Scott |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added O'Neill |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3352 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy