MN HF3334 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trunk highway project bidding procedures amended, and use of alternative bidding required for competing paving materials.
Title
Trunk highway project bidding procedures amended, and use of alternative bidding required for competing paving materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Juhnke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar | |
2010-04-12 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-25 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-11 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-11 | House: Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division | |
2010-03-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Transit Policy and Oversight Division |