MN HF3364 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Priority required for children placed in foster care to access school-age care programs, school-age care revenue eligibility and uses modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Priority required for children placed in foster care to access school-age care programs, school-age care revenue eligibility and uses modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4192 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Duckworth