MN HF3376 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Digital image use allowed as proof of possession of passes and licenses, and electronic device use provided to display documents.
Title
Digital image use allowed as proof of possession of passes and licenses, and electronic device use provided to display documents.
Sponsors
Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Secretary of State Chapter 92 | |
2024-05-06 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-05-06 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-05-06 | Governor approval | |
2024-05-03 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-04-29 | House | Returned from Senate |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3400 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3400, now on General Orders |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-11 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2024-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 11, 2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-15 | House | Authors added Brand and Virnig |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Pursell, and Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3400 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3376, SF indefinitely postponed