MN HF338 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Authors added Frederick and Moller
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Authors added Frederick and Moller
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct Care Service Corps established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Direct Care Service Corps established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Authors added Frederick and Moller |
2021-02-08 | House | Authors added Bahner, Masin |
2021-02-04 | House | Authors added Pryor, Acomb, Lippert and Elkins |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF111 (Similar To) 2021-02-01 - Author added Duckworth