MN HF3389 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Science and Technology authority created, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Science and Technology authority created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Larry Haws [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | House: Author added Bunn | |
2010-03-18 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | House: Referred by Chair to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division | |
2010-03-09 | House: Author added Haws | |
2010-03-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |