MN HF341 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offense sentencing guidelines reviewed.
Title
Sex offense sentencing guidelines reviewed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF111 (Similar To) 2019-05-19 - Third reading Passed