MN HF3435 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Census activity applicability clarified.
Title
Census activity applicability clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Second reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3875 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Author added Pha