MN HF3438 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Failure to disclose mandatory fees in advertising added as a deceptive trade practice.
Title
Failure to disclose mandatory fees in advertising added as a deceptive trade practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3438 (Y: 63 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 111 | |
2024-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2024-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Third reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2024-05-15 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-13 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2024-05-13 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2024-05-13 | House | House adopted conference committee report motion recurred |
2024-05-13 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2024-05-13 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2024-05-13 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2024-05-13 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-05-07 | House | Senate conferees Port; Marty; Rasmusson |
2024-05-07 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate conferees Port; Marty; Rasmusson |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2024-05-02 | Senate | House conferees Greenman; Rehm; Dotseth |
2024-05-02 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-05-01 | House | House conferees Greenman, Rehm, Dotseth |
2024-05-01 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-05-01 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3537 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3537, now on General Orders |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-11 | House | Author added Reyer |
2024-04-11 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-11 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-11 | House | Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Author added Bahner |
2024-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Elkins |
2024-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3537 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Author added Boldon