MN HF346 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health service rate increase bridge established.
Title
Mental health service rate increase bridge established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-28 | House | Author added Bakeberg |
2023-03-22 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2023-03-20 | House | Authors added Nelson, N.; and Myers |
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Frazier |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Moller |
2023-02-28 | House | Author added Baker |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Elkins |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Smith |
2023-01-18 | House | Authors added Hicks; Acomb |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF926 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Author added Draheim