MN HF3471 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Free school milk with lunch meal authorized for students who bring lunch from home, and money appropriated.
Title
Free school milk with lunch meal authorized for students who bring lunch from home, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Hicks [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] |
Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Sencer-Mura and Pursell |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |