MN HF3474 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - House: Authors added Nornes and Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - House: Authors added Nornes and Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incandescent light bulbs manufactured in Minnesota use and sale authorized.
Title
Incandescent light bulbs manufactured in Minnesota use and sale authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | House: Authors added Nornes and Murdock | |
2010-03-18 | House: Author added Drazkowski | |
2010-03-17 | House: Author added Seifert | |
2010-03-15 | House: Authors added Emmer and Scott | |
2010-03-11 | House: Author added Westrom | |
2010-03-09 | House: Authors added Beard and Anderson, P. | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF3474&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF3474.0.pdf |