MN HF3665 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Knoblach.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Knoblach.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Display of national motto in school buildings required.
Title
Display of national motto in school buildings required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Knoblach. |
2018-04-16 | House | Authors added Heintzeman and Urdahl. |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added McDonald, Peterson, Dettmer, and Franson. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3061 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Referred to E-12 Policy