MN HF3843 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Landlords required to accept tenant's individual taxpayer identification number in lieu of Social Security number.
Title
Landlords required to accept tenant's individual taxpayer identification number in lieu of Social Security number.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] |
Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Larry Kraft [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Kraft |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Acomb |
2024-02-19 | House | Authors added Sencer-Mura and Pursell |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3769 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety