MN HF390 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No-cost diagnostic services and testing required following mammogram.
Title
No-cost diagnostic services and testing required following mammogram.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Koznick |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF329 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services