MN HF410 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victim's estate authorized to request or enforce an order for restitution.
Title
Crime victim's estate authorized to request or enforce an order for restitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2013-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF345 |
2013-03-06 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |