MN HF4187 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Murphy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Murphy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternate hospital inpatient payment rate specified.
Title
Alternate hospital inpatient payment rate specified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Murphy |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Elkins |
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4238 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Author added Abeler