MN HF422 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-12 - House: Author added Slocum
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-12 - House: Author added Slocum
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Fallen Firefighters Memorial Day designated as the first Sunday in October.
Title
Minnesota Fallen Firefighters Memorial Day designated as the first Sunday in October.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-12 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2009-02-09 | House: Author added Bly | |
2009-02-05 | House: Authors added Urdahl, Morrow, Hilstrom and Reinert | |
2009-02-02 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0422&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0422.0.pdf |