MN HF4237 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Highway 169 portion between Marble and Mountain Iron designated as "Senator David J. Tomassoni Memorial Cross Range Expressway."
Title
U.S. Highway 169 portion between Marble and Mountain Iron designated as "Senator David J. Tomassoni Memorial Cross Range Expressway."
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Spencer Igo [R] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Roger Skraba [R] |
Rep. Ben Davis [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-29 | House | Author added Lillie |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3881 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Secretary of State, Filed