MN HF4322 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable aviation fuel definition amended.
Title
Sustainable aviation fuel definition amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Brand |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-02-29 | House | Author added Lillie |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4011 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development