MN HF4364 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Scott
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Scott
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State debt limit established.
Title
State debt limit established.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Ben Davis [R] | Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Marj Fogelman [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Scott |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Fogelman |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Backer and Koznick |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5467 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Author added Nelson