MN HF4425 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor's action Approval Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor's action Approval Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus bonding bill.
Title
Omnibus bonding bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor's action Approval Chapter 214 | |
2018-05-30 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 113-17 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-20 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2018-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-05-20 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 42-25 |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Reconsidered amendment |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Taken from table |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-14 | House | Bill was passed vote: 122-3 |
2018-05-14 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-04-19 | House | Author added Poston. |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF4021 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - HF substituted HF4425