MN HF4504 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retail delivery tax repealed.
Title
Retail delivery tax repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Myers |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4772 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Referred to Transportation