MN HF4569 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-26 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-26 - Author added Virnig
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wage theft prevented and use of responsible contractors required when Minnesota Housing Finance Agency provides financial assistance for development of multiunit residential housing.
Title
Wage theft prevented and use of responsible contractors required when Minnesota Housing Finance Agency provides financial assistance for development of multiunit residential housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Kraft |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Rehm |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-11 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Lee, K. |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy |
2024-03-07 | House | Authors added Nelson, M. and Hussein |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4593 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha