MN HF4600 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Zeleznikar
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ambulance staffing requirements and emergency medical responder registration modified, authority to reinstate ambulance service personnel certifications extended, requirements for approval and reapproval of education programs modified, and appropriation modified.
Title
Ambulance staffing requirements and emergency medical responder registration modified, authority to reinstate ambulance service personnel certifications extended, requirements for approval and reapproval of education programs modified, and appropriation modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Backer |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4697 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Author added Rasmusson