MN HF461 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Shaver Lake; general aquatic plant management permit required for mechanical control of hybrid and narrow-leaved cattails.
Title
Shaver Lake; general aquatic plant management permit required for mechanical control of hybrid and narrow-leaved cattails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 108 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 111 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 111 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 75 | |
2013-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-14 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 108-20 |
2013-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | Motion prevailed |
2013-05-14 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2013-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF248 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF248, now on General Orders |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-05-06 | House | Bill was passed vote: 111-17 |
2013-05-06 | House | Third reading |
2013-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 6, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |