MN HF4649 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Motion did not prevail
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-16 - Motion did not prevail
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; drivers' license issuance provided during emergency.
Title
COVID-19; drivers' license issuance provided during emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2020-05-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-05-16 | House | Authors added Baker, Petersburg, and Erickson |
2020-05-14 | House | Author added Backer |
2020-05-12 | House | Authors added Pierson, Koznick, Hansen, and Boe |
2020-05-11 | House | Authors added Neu, Robbins, Dettmer, Garofalo, Scott, Hertaus |
2020-05-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4613 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy