MN HF4649 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources trust fund renewal and modification provided, providing for housing fund and Housing Fund Council, lottery provisions modified, money appropriated, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Environment and natural resources trust fund renewal and modification provided, providing for housing fund and Housing Fund Council, lottery provisions modified, money appropriated, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2022-05-12 | House | Author added Jordan |
2022-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2022-05-09 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-05-05 | House | Author added Pinto |
2022-04-19 | House | Authors added Freiberg, Feist and Boe |
2022-04-04 | House | Authors added Long and Moller |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4131 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections