MN HF4993 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services forecast adjustments made, and money appropriated.
Title
Human services forecast adjustments made, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-11 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2024-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Pinto |
2024-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5082 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended