MN HF5006 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Robbins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Robbins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of transportation network companies by political subdivisions prohibited.
Title
Regulation of transportation network companies by political subdivisions prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Harry Niska [R] | Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] |
Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House: H.F. NO. 5006 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Robbins |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added West |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5016 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Authors added Kreun; Rasmusson; Coleman; Abeler